Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.05.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
05.05.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: fee payment | |
05.05.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
24.03.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] |
22.03.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.07.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] |