EP1564808 - Electronic apparatus having liquid cooling system therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naganawa, Takashi, Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Minamitani, Rintaro, Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Ohashi, Shigeo, Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Nishihara, Atsuo, Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04021062.7 | 03.09.2004 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | JP20040038134 | 16.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004038134 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1564808 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/433 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
H05K7/20009 (EP,US);
H05K7/20 (KR);
G06F1/203 (EP,US);
H01L23/4332 (EP,US);
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0031 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/19] |
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronisches Gerät mit einer flüssigkeitsgekühlten Vorrichtung | [2005/33] | English: | Electronic apparatus having liquid cooling system therein | [2005/33] | French: | Système de refroidissement par un liquide pour un appareil électronique | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 08.05.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05121608 ; | [X]JP01014943 ; | [X]JPS6245155 ; | [X]US4558395 (YAMADA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,6,10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5166863 (SHMUNIS GREGORY [US]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930902), vol. 017, no. 484, Database accession no. (E - 1426), & JP05121608 A 19930518 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890510), vol. 013, no. 195, Database accession no. (E - 754), & JP01014943 A 19890119 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,3,6,8 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870723), vol. 011, no. 227, Database accession no. (E - 526), & JP62045155 A 19870227 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,10 * the whole document * |