blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1635063

EP1635063 - Hydraulic gear motor with reduced flowate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.08.2012
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.09.2012  [2012/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sagawe, Johann
Grüner Winkel 12
77876 Kappelrodeck / DE
For all designated states
Sagawe, Gottfried
Unterer Bergauerplatz 12
90402 Nürnberg / DE
For all designated states
Kist, Eberhard
Kirchwegstrasse 45
77855 Achern / DE
[2010/11]
Former [2006/11]For all designated states
Sagawe, Johann
Grüner Winkel 12
77876 Kappelrodeck / DE
For all designated states
Sagawe, Gottfried
Unterer Bergauerplatz 12
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sagawe, Johann
Grüner Winkel 12
77876 Kappelrodeck / DE
02 / Sagawe, Gottfried
Unterer Bergauerplatz 12
90402 Nürnberg / DE
 [2010/11]
Former [2006/11]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK
Prinzenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/11]Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK
Prinzenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date04021272.208.09.2004
[2006/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1635063
Date:15.03.2006
Language:DE
[2006/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2005
ClassificationIPC:F04C2/14
[2006/11]
CPC:
F04C2/14 (EP); F04C2/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/11]
TitleGerman:Hydraulischer Zahnradmotor mit reduziertem Schluckvolumen[2006/11]
English:Hydraulic gear motor with reduced flowate[2006/11]
French:Motor hydraulique à engrenages à débit réduit[2006/11]
Examination procedure08.06.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/30]
03.04.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/39]
10.05.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
10.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200805   M06   Fee paid on   18.11.2008
30.09.200906   M06   Fee paid on   16.03.2010
30.09.201108   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Date:14.10.2009
[2009/49]
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0245670  ;
 [A]JPH03213684  ;
 [Y]US1664745  (HOAGLAND FRANK O) [Y] 14 * page 2, line 78 - line 96; figure 6 *;
 [AD]DE2242269  (SHIMADZU CORP) [AD] 1-19 * figures 1,5,6 *;
 [Y]GB2023736  (KIPER G) [Y] 5-7 * page 1, line 47 - line 89; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [XY]DE4310211  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3,8,12,16-19 * column 6, line 8 - column 7, line 41; figure 5 * [Y] 5-7,14
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900427), vol. 014, no. 209, Database accession no. (M - 0968), & JP02045670 A 19900215 (NIIGATA CONVERTER KK) [X] 1,17 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911212), vol. 015, no. 491, Database accession no. (M - 1190), & JP03213684 A 19910919 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.