EP1514709 - Ventilation System for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/11] | Air duct assembly | ||
[2010/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dieksander, Wolfgang Obersdorfstrasse 18-1 70794 Filderstadt / DE | 02 /
Hörig, Harald Hindenburgstrasse 1 76476 Bischweier / DE | [2005/11] | Application number, filing date | 04021335.7 | 08.09.2004 | [2005/11] | Priority number, date | DE2003142873 | 15.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10342873 | [2005/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1514709 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1514709 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1514709 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60H1/24 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
B60H1/246 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, IT, SE [2007/01] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug-Belüftungssystem | [2010/09] | English: | Ventilation System for a vehicle | [2010/09] | French: | Système de ventilation pour véhicule | [2010/09] |
Former [2005/11] | Anordnung von Luftkanälen | ||
Former [2005/11] | Air duct assembly | ||
Former [2005/11] | Assemblage de conduits d'air | Examination procedure | 26.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.06.2010 | [2010/49] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE850116 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR) [A] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [A]SE502376 (TORGNY THOREN [SE]) [A] 1-3,6,10* figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1059180 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 4-8 * figures 8a-c *; | [X]WO0140698 (OEYEN SVERRE [NO]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 30 - page 5, line 2; figures 1a,1b,1c * |