EP1516802 - Side wall pillar of a bus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/12] | Support pillar for a body skeleton | ||
[2008/44] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Dachauer Strasse 667 80995 München / DE | [2005/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Junginger, Jörg Mittermayrstrasse 17 80796 München / DE | 02 /
Riebeck, Lars Hermann-Stockmann-Strasse 85 85221 Dachau / DE | 03 /
Schöttl, Christoph Ettaler Strasse 12 82061 Neuried / DE | [2005/12] | Application number, filing date | 04021407.4 | 09.09.2004 | [2005/12] | Priority number, date | DE20031042842 | 17.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10342842 | [2005/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1516802 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1516802 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1516802 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2009/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1516802 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D23/00, B62D31/02 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B62D31/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, PL, SE, TR [2007/11] |
Former [2007/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, LI | ||
Former [2005/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Seitenwandsäule eines Omnibusses | [2008/44] | English: | Side wall pillar of a bus | [2008/44] | French: | Colonne de paroi latéral d'un autobus | [2008/44] |
Former [2005/12] | Tragsäule für ein Karosseriegerippe | ||
Former [2005/12] | Support pillar for a body skeleton | ||
Former [2005/12] | Colonne de support pour une ossature de carrosserie | Examination procedure | 25.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 02.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Stückrad, Björn, et al, et al Daimler AG Intellectual Property Management HPC U800 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/45] | 03.11.2009 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 19.12.2009 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 08.01.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.05.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.05.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.05.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.06.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.06.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.02.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0733539 (PORSCHE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 2,3,13 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19644047 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0952067 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,14,15 * figure 1 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-4,6-13; | [Y]DE19829832 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 6-11 * figure . *; | [A]DE19903722 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19903724 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]WO0130638 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * page 7, line 7 - line 11 *; | [Y]EP1138581 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 3,4,12 * column 7, line 23 * * column 8, line 2 - line 5 * |