EP1524576 - Step-up converter with power factor control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [2007/27] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für Elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Alois Am Aufleck 18a 86633 Neuburg / DE | 02 /
Limmer, Walter Lindwurmstrasse 80 80337 München / DE | 03 /
Mühlschlegel, Joachim Hans-Sachs-Strasse 35 82194 Gröbenzell / DE | [2005/16] | Application number, filing date | 04021714.3 | 13.09.2004 | [2005/16] | Priority number, date | DE2003148210 | 16.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10348210 | [2005/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1524576 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1524576 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/70, H02M1/00 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
H02M1/4225 (EP,US);
G05F1/70 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/02] |
Former [2005/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hochsetzsteller mit Leistungsfaktorkorrektur | [2005/16] | English: | Step-up converter with power factor control | [2005/16] | French: | Convertisseur de tension survolteur avec régulation de facteur de puissance | [2005/16] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 22.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5757166 (SODHI SAMEER [US]) [A] 2,3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0979025 (LAPLAZ LIGHT CO [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [DA]WO0169984 (LAPLAZ LIGHT CO INC [US], et al) [DA] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]DE10040411 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0052]; figure 1 *; | [A] - LAZAR J ET AL, "Open loop control of a unity power factor, discontinuous conduction mode boost rectifier", TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENERGY CONFERENCE, 1995. INTELEC '95., 17TH INTERNATIONAL THE HAGUE, NETHERLANDS 29 OCT.-1 NOV. 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19951029), ISBN 0-7803-2750-0, pages 671 - 676, XP010161310 [A] 1-5 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INTLEC.1995.499030 |