EP1498401 - SILICON BASED SUBSTRATE WITH A CTE COMPATIBLE LAYER ON THE SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/03] | SILICON BASED SUBSTRATE WITH A CTE COMPATIBLE LAYER ON THE SUBSTANCE | ||
[2010/27] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 1 Financial Building 1 Financial Plaza Hartford Connecticut 06101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 1 Financial Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, Connecticut 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sun, Ellen Y. 17 Summerwind Drive South Windsor CT 06074 / US | 02 /
Eaton, Harry E. 391 Perrin Road Woodstock CT 06281 / US | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04021906.5 | 17.12.2002 | [2005/03] | Priority number, date | US20010034677 | 19.12.2001 Original published format: US 34677 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1498401 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1498401 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/87, C04B41/89, C23C4/10, F01D5/28 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/87 (KR);
B32B18/00 (KR);
C04B41/5051 (EP,US);
C04B41/89 (KR);
C23C28/04 (EP,US);
C23C28/048 (EP,US);
C23C30/00 (EP,US);
C23C4/10 (KR);
C23C4/11 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
F05D2230/90 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/565 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/584 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/597 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B35/806 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | SILIZIUM ENTHALTENDES SUBSTRAT MIT BESCHICHTUNG MIT ANGEPASSTEM THERMISCHEM AUSDEHNUNGSKOEFFIZIENTEN | [2005/03] | English: | SILICON BASED SUBSTRATE WITH A CTE COMPATIBLE LAYER ON THE SUBSTRATE | [2010/27] | French: | SUBSTRAT A BASE DE SILICIUM MUNI D'UNE COUCHE A DILATATION THERMIQUE ADAPTEE | [2005/03] |
Former [2005/03] | SILICON BASED SUBSTRATE WITH A CTE COMPATIBLE LAYER ON THE SUBSTANCE | Examination procedure | 29.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 30.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02258674.7 / EP1323689 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020258674) is 02.03.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4252860 (BRENNAN JOHN J, et al) [X] 1,6-8 * claim 5 *; | [X]US5008149 (TAGA YASUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * examples 12,14 *; | [X]US6086990 (SUMINO HIROYASU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * examples 3-6,8,9,11-14,17 *; | [X]EP1044943 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8 * claims 1,7,8,16,18,22 *; | [X]EP1044944 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8 * claims 1,6,10,13,14 *; | [X] - OKUWADA K ET AL, "Preparation of Pb(Mg1/3Nb2/3)O3 thin film by sol-gel method", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 2 (LETTERS) JAPAN, (1989), vol. 28, no. 7, ISSN 0021-4922, pages L1271 - L1273, XP000073559 [X] 1-4,6-8 * figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.28.L1271 | [X] - HIRANO S-I ET AL, "PREPARATION OF POTASSIUM TANTALATE NIOBATE BY SOL-GEL METHOD", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19920601), vol. 75, no. 6, ISSN 0002-7820, pages 1701 - 1704, XP000651527 [X] 1-4,6-8 * abstract * * page L1271, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1151-2916.1992.tb04252.x | by applicant | EP1044943 | - OKUWADA K ET AL., "Preparation of Pb (Mgi/3 Nb2/3) 03 Thin Film by Sol-Gel Method", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (1989), vol. 28, no. 2, page L1271 | - HIRANO S-I ET AL., "Preparation of Potassium Tantalate Niobate by Sol-Gel Method", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, (1992), vol. 75, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1151-2916.1992.tb04252.x, page 1701, XP000651527 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1151-2916.1992.tb04252.x |