EP1519153 - Navigation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Kunihiro Int.Prop.Div. AISIN AW Co. Ltd. 6-18 Harayama Oka-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-8564 / JP | 02 /
Kano, Toshihiro Int.Prop.Div. AISIN AW Co. Ltd. 6-18 Harayama Oka-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-8564 / JP | 03 /
Ogawa, Satoshi Int.Prop.Div. AISIN AW Co. Ltd. 6-18 Harayama Oka-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-8564 / JP | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/13] | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022211.9 | 17.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | JP20030337073 | 29.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003337073 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1519153 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36, G06F17/30 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
G01C21/3682 (EP,US);
G01C21/3608 (EP,US);
G06F16/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/51] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Navigationsvorrichtung | [2005/13] | English: | Navigation apparatus | [2005/13] | French: | Dispositif de navigation | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 23.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.10.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0944513 ; | [X]US6240360 (PHELAN SEAN [GB]) [X] 1,2,11,12,21,22 * column 3, line 39 - line 43 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 1 * * column 5, line 17 - line 25 * * column 6, line 14 * * column 8, line 24 - line 35 * * column 9, line 1 - line 36; claim 1 *; | [XY]EP1160694 (NAVIGATION TECH CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,10-16,20-22 * paragraphs [0027] , [0055] , [0057] , [0095] - [0097] - [0100] , [0114] , [0126]; figures 4,5,9 * [Y] 7-9,17-19; | [Y]EP1167925 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 7,17 * paragraph [0079]; figures 8,9 *; | [X]US2002169541 (BOUVE W LINCOLN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10-12,15,16,20-22 * paragraphs [0049] , [0050] , [0053] , [0054] , [0070]; figure 4; claim 19 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09044513 A 19970214 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 8,9,18,19 * abstract * |