EP1491490 - Detection method in a capping apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/01] | Capping method and apparatus | ||
[2005/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIBUYA KOGYO CO., LTD Koh 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | [2006/04] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states SHIBUYA KOGYO CO., LTD Koh 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-Shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitamoto, Hiroaki Shibuya Kogyo Co.,Ltd. Koh, 58-Banchi Mameda-Honmachi Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04022292.9 | 12.02.2001 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | JP20000060594 | 06.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000060594 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491490 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1491490 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B67B3/26, B67B3/20 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
B67B3/264 (EP,US);
B67B3/20 (EP,US);
B67B3/206 (EP,US);
B67B3/2093 (EP,US);
B67B3/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/01] | Title | German: | Detektionsverfahren in einer Kapselmaschine | [2005/33] | English: | Detection method in a capping apparatus | [2005/33] | French: | Méthode de détection dans une machine à capsuler | [2005/33] |
Former [2005/01] | Kapselmaschine und -Verfahren | ||
Former [2005/01] | Capping method and apparatus | ||
Former [2005/01] | Méthode et machine à capsuler | Examination procedure | 06.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 26.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01301209.1 / EP1132331 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/43] | IT | 25.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0618168 (GEI FILLING CAPPING & LABELLIN [GB]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 51 - line 58 * * column 3, line 55 - column 49 * * column 10, line 27 - line 30 ** claims 1,7 * |