EP1519458 - Laser diode module, laser apparatus and laser processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laserfront Technologies, Inc. 1120 Shimokuzawa, Sagamihara Kanagawa 229-1198 / JP | [2006/46] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Laserfront Technologies, Inc. 1120 Shimokuzawa, Sagamihara Kanagawa 229-1198 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kouta, Hikaru c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Hisaya c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ono, Hideyuki c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ikeda, Yuuzou c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Tunekane, Masaki c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Kubota, Keiichi c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Ishida, Toshinori, c/o Laserfront Technologies, Inc. 1120, Shimokuzawa Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229-1198 / JP | [2006/24] |
Former [2005/13] | 01 /
Kouta, Hikaru c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Takahashi, Hisaya c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Ono, Hideyuki c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Ikeda, Yuuzou c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Tunekane, Masaki c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
06 /
Kubota, Keiichi c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
07 /
Ishida, Toshinori Laserfront Technologies, Inc. 1120, Shimokuzawa Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229-1198 / JP | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022431.3 | 21.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | JP20030336594 | 29.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003336594 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1519458 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1519458 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1519458 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/022, H01S5/024 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
H01S5/02423 (EP,US);
H01S5/024 (KR);
H01S5/02365 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/49175 (EP);
H01S5/0021 (EP,US);
H01S5/02345 (EP,US);
H01S5/0237 (EP,US);
H01S5/02476 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/11] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Laserdiodenmodul, Laservorrichtung und Laserbearbeitungsvorrichtung | [2005/13] | English: | Laser diode module, laser apparatus and laser processing apparatus | [2005/13] | French: | Module de diode laser, appareil laser et appareil d'usinage au laser | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 29.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0805527 (CUTTING EDGE OPTRONICS INC [US]) [AD] 1,4-15 * column 4, line 36 - column 8, line 35; figures 1,5 * * column 9, lines 34-43 *; | [AD]US5978396 (DUCHEMIN JEAN PASCAL [FR], et al) [AD] 1,2,13-15 * column 3, lines 4-48; figures 2-4,11 * * column 6, lines 27-31 *; | [A]US6266353 (FREITAS BARRY L [US], et al) [A] 1,13-15 * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 28; figures 1-3,6-8 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 7 *; | [A]US2003142711 (TREUSCH HANS-GEORG [US], et al) [A] * paragraph [0010]; figures 1,2 ** paragraph [0012] * |