EP1516724 - Presensitized plate and lithographic printing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hotta, Hisashi Fuji Photo Film, Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Hotta, Yoshinori Fuji Photo Film, Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022484.2 | 22.09.2004 | [2005/12] | Priority number, date | JP20030329951 | 22.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003329951 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1516724 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1516724 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10, B41N1/00, B41N1/08, B41N3/03 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B41C1/1008 (EP,US);
B41N3/03 (EP,US);
B41N3/038 (EP,US);
B41C1/1016 (EP,US);
B41C2201/02 (EP,US);
B41C2201/12 (EP,US);
B41C2201/14 (EP,US);
B41C2210/04 (EP,US);
B41C2210/08 (EP,US);
B41C2210/20 (EP,US);
B41C2210/22 (EP,US);
B41C2210/24 (EP,US);
B41N3/034 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Title | German: | Vorsensibilisierte Platte und lithographisches Druckverfahren | [2005/12] | English: | Presensitized plate and lithographic printing method | [2005/12] | French: | Plaque présensibilisée et méthode d'impression lithographique | [2005/12] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 13.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | BE | 04.04.2007 | CH | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | CZ | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | EE | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | FR | 04.04.2007 | IT | 04.04.2007 | LI | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | PL | 04.04.2007 | RO | 04.04.2007 | SI | 04.04.2007 | SK | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | BG | 04.07.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | ES | 15.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | LU | 22.09.2007 | IE | 24.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | HU | 05.10.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
LU | 22.09.2007 | ||
IE | 24.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 24.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 24.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 24.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 24.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 04.04.2007 | |
ES | 15.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1170149 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,15,16,19 * paragraphs [0076] , [0079] , [0101] , [0129] , [0130] *; | [X]EP1251014 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,15,16,19 * paragraphs [0069] , [0074] , [0076] , [0077] , [0117] *; | [X]US2002177074 (HOSHI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,15,16,19 * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] - [0117] , [0118] , [0120] - [0122] - [0140]; claims 1,3 *; | [X]EP1266753 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0154] , [0210] , [0224] , [0225] , [0260]; claim 1 *; | [XP]EP1348570 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,15,16,19* paragraphs [0084] - [0098] - [0272] - [0275] *; | [XP]EP1396349 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-3,15,16,19 * paragraphs [0063] - [0066] - [0097] - [0099] - [0115] , [0118] - [0120] * |