EP1518908 - Ink composition for electrostatic ink-jet recording and method of ink-jet recording [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasai, Seishi Fuji Photo Film, Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022487.5 | 22.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | JP20030333519 | 25.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003333519 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1518908 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1518908 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
C09D11/32 (EP,US);
C09D11/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Title | German: | Tintenzusammensetzung für elektrostatische Tintenstrahlaufzeichnung und Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren | [2005/13] | English: | Ink composition for electrostatic ink-jet recording and method of ink-jet recording | [2005/13] | French: | Composition d'encre pour enregistrement électrostatique par jet d'encre et procédé d'enregistrement par jet d'encre | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.05.2007 | BE | 30.05.2007 | CH | 30.05.2007 | CY | 30.05.2007 | CZ | 30.05.2007 | DK | 30.05.2007 | EE | 30.05.2007 | FI | 30.05.2007 | IT | 30.05.2007 | LI | 30.05.2007 | NL | 30.05.2007 | PL | 30.05.2007 | RO | 30.05.2007 | SI | 30.05.2007 | SK | 30.05.2007 | TR | 30.05.2007 | BG | 30.08.2007 | SE | 30.08.2007 | GR | 31.08.2007 | ES | 10.09.2007 | LU | 22.09.2007 | IE | 24.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | PT | 30.10.2007 | HU | 01.12.2007 | FR | 25.01.2008 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
EE | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
RO | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
LU | 22.09.2007 | ||
IE | 24.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FR | 25.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
EE | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
RO | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
IE | 24.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FR | 25.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
EE | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
RO | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
IE | 24.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FR | 25.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
RO | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
IE | 24.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FR | 25.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
RO | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FR | 25.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
RO | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IT | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SK | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
BG | 30.08.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
PL | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
SE | 30.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 10.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0635380 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM [JP]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5952048 (TSUBUKO KAZUO [JP], et al) [DA] 1,7* column W *; | [A]US2002098435 (ROHR ULRIKE [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0019] - [0032] - [0059] , [0112] * |