EP1592285 - Apparatus for controlling inverter circuit of induction heat cooker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeoeuido-dong, Youngdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeoeuido-dong, Youngdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryu, Seung Hee No. 301 Iljin villa 394-40 Anyang8-dong Manan-ku Anyang-si Kyungki-do 430-018 / KR | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Urner, Peter TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022525.2 | 22.09.2004 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | KR20040028982 | 27.04.2004 Original published format: KR 2004028982 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592285 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/04, H05B6/06, H05B6/12 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
H05B6/04 (EP,US);
H05B6/06 (KR);
H05B6/062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/27] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einrichtung für die Steuerung eines Wechselrichters in einem Induktionskochgerät | [2005/44] | English: | Apparatus for controlling inverter circuit of induction heat cooker | [2005/44] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'un onduleur pour un appareil de cuisson à induction | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/49] | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4356371 (KIUCHI MITSUYUKI, et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 3, lines 1-55 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US4599504 (ITO SUSUMU [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 2-4 * * column 6, lines 38-65 * * column 11, lines 55-65 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US4757177 (SUZUKI TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 6, lines 6-29; figure 1 ** claim 1 *; | [A]US4764652 (LEE MIN K [KR]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 15 * * column 3, lines 35-47 * * claim 1 * |