EP1496581 - Optical amplifier for use in optical communications equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohshima, Chihiro Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Kinoshita, Susumu Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Chikama, Terumi Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022788.6 | 24.03.1998 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | JP19970285905 | 17.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28590597 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1496581 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1496581 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/06, H01S3/094, H01S3/131, H01S3/067 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
H01S3/06704 (EP,US);
H01S3/094003 (EP,US);
G02F1/093 (EP,US);
H01S3/06754 (EP,US);
H01S3/09408 (EP,US);
H01S5/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/02] | H01S3/067, H01S3/094 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/02] | Title | German: | Optischer Verstärker für optisches Nachrichtenübertragungssystem | [2005/02] | English: | Optical amplifier for use in optical communications equipment | [2005/02] | French: | Amplificateur optique pour système de communication optique | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 04.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/21] | 19.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98105296.2 / EP0910140 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0888430 ; | [A]JPH08304860 ; | [A]JPH09200130 ; | [A]JPH06177837 ; | [A]US5241414 (GILES CLINTON R [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 1 - line 22 * * claims 1,7 *; | [A]EP0722232 (NEDERLAND PTT [NL]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 9 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0762569 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 4 * column 3, line 33 - line 43 * * figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08088430 A 19960402 (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08304860 A 19961122 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD < KDD>) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 1,2,8B * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09200130 A 19970731 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940926), vol. 018, no. 509, Database accession no. (E - 1610), & JP06177837 A 19940624 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |