EP1525810 - Multifunctional conveyor drum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauni Maschinenbau AG Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [2005/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Folger, Manfred Klaus-Schaumann-Strasse 103 21035 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Wedekind, Dierk Bullerberg 3 21493 Grossschretstaken / DE | 03 /
Horn, Sönke Ilenweg 54 21502 Geesthacht / DE | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Seemann, Ralph Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Seemann, Ralph, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner, Ballindamm 3 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04022901.5 | 25.09.2004 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | DE2003149967 | 24.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10349967 | [2005/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525810 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/32, A24C5/47, A24C5/33, A24D3/02 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
A24C5/327 (EP,US);
A24C5/478 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Title | German: | Multifunktionsfördertrommel | [2005/17] | English: | Multifunctional conveyor drum | [2005/17] | French: | Tambour d'acheminement multifunctions | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1127062 (SKODA NP) [A] 1 * page 2, line 87 - line 129; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1065781 (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3,6,7 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0044]; figures 2-6 *; | [A]WO03043449 (FOCKE & CO [DE], et al) [A] * page 8, line 16 - page 10, line 23; figures 8-13 *; | [PA]EP1425979 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [PA] * paragraph [0025] *; | [PX]EP1447016 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4,8-11 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030] *; | [PA]EP1452100 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [PA] * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010]; figures 1-4 * |