EP1559846 - Panels and systems of such panels for instance for suspended ceilings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soft Cells A/S Lundbergsvej 10 8400 Ebeltoft / DK | [2006/25] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Soft Cells A/S Lundbergsveg 10 8400 Ebeltoft / DK | ||
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Art Andersen A/S Gl. Kongevej 3 1610 Koebenhavn / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nielsen, Jesper Svanemoellevej 1A 2100 Copenhagen / DK | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S, Vester Soegade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 04022999.9 | 28.09.2004 | [2005/31] | Priority number, date | EP20040001760 | 28.01.2004 Original published format: EP 04001760 | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1559846 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1559846 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/00, E04B9/24 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
E04B9/003 (EP,US);
E04B9/247 (EP,US);
E04B2009/0492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Title | German: | Deckenelemente und Anordnungen solcher Deckenelemente für abgehängte Decken | [2005/31] | English: | Panels and systems of such panels for instance for suspended ceilings | [2005/31] | French: | Panneaux et systèmes de tels panneaux dans un faux plafond | [2005/31] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09000596.8 / EP2048299 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.02.2009 | BE | 04.02.2009 | CY | 04.02.2009 | CZ | 04.02.2009 | DK | 04.02.2009 | EE | 04.02.2009 | FI | 04.02.2009 | IT | 04.02.2009 | NL | 04.02.2009 | PL | 04.02.2009 | RO | 04.02.2009 | SI | 04.02.2009 | SK | 04.02.2009 | TR | 04.02.2009 | BG | 04.05.2009 | SE | 04.05.2009 | GR | 05.05.2009 | ES | 15.05.2009 | PT | 06.07.2009 | HU | 05.08.2009 | IE | 28.09.2009 | LU | 28.09.2009 | CH | 30.09.2009 | FR | 30.09.2009 | LI | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 04.02.2009 | |
BE | 04.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.02.2009 | ||
DK | 04.02.2009 | ||
EE | 04.02.2009 | ||
FI | 04.02.2009 | ||
IT | 04.02.2009 | ||
NL | 04.02.2009 | ||
PL | 04.02.2009 | ||
RO | 04.02.2009 | ||
SI | 04.02.2009 | ||
SK | 04.02.2009 | ||
BG | 04.05.2009 | ||
SE | 04.05.2009 | ||
GR | 05.05.2009 | ||
ES | 15.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.07.2009 | ||
HU | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 28.09.2009 | ||
LU | 28.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 04.02.2009 | |
BE | 04.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.02.2009 | ||
DK | 04.02.2009 | ||
EE | 04.02.2009 | ||
FI | 04.02.2009 | ||
IT | 04.02.2009 | ||
NL | 04.02.2009 | ||
PL | 04.02.2009 | ||
RO | 04.02.2009 | ||
SI | 04.02.2009 | ||
SK | 04.02.2009 | ||
BG | 04.05.2009 | ||
SE | 04.05.2009 | ||
GR | 05.05.2009 | ||
ES | 15.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.07.2009 | ||
IE | 28.09.2009 | ||
LU | 28.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 04.02.2009 | |
BE | 04.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.02.2009 | ||
DK | 04.02.2009 | ||
EE | 04.02.2009 | ||
FI | 04.02.2009 | ||
IT | 04.02.2009 | ||
NL | 04.02.2009 | ||
PL | 04.02.2009 | ||
RO | 04.02.2009 | ||
SI | 04.02.2009 | ||
SK | 04.02.2009 | ||
BG | 04.05.2009 | ||
SE | 04.05.2009 | ||
GR | 05.05.2009 | ||
ES | 15.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.07.2009 | ||
IE | 28.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 04.02.2009 | |
BE | 04.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.02.2009 | ||
DK | 04.02.2009 | ||
EE | 04.02.2009 | ||
FI | 04.02.2009 | ||
NL | 04.02.2009 | ||
PL | 04.02.2009 | ||
RO | 04.02.2009 | ||
SI | 04.02.2009 | ||
SK | 04.02.2009 | ||
BG | 04.05.2009 | ||
SE | 04.05.2009 | ||
GR | 05.05.2009 | ||
ES | 15.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.07.2009 | ||
IE | 28.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 04.02.2009 | |
BE | 04.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.02.2009 | ||
DK | 04.02.2009 | ||
EE | 04.02.2009 | ||
FI | 04.02.2009 | ||
NL | 04.02.2009 | ||
PL | 04.02.2009 | ||
RO | 04.02.2009 | ||
SI | 04.02.2009 | ||
SK | 04.02.2009 | ||
BG | 04.05.2009 | ||
SE | 04.05.2009 | ||
ES | 15.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.07.2009 | ||
IE | 28.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 04.02.2009 | |
BE | 04.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.02.2009 | ||
DK | 04.02.2009 | ||
EE | 04.02.2009 | ||
FI | 04.02.2009 | ||
NL | 04.02.2009 | ||
PL | 04.02.2009 | ||
RO | 04.02.2009 | ||
SI | 04.02.2009 | ||
SK | 04.02.2009 | ||
BG | 04.05.2009 | ||
SE | 04.05.2009 | ||
ES | 15.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 04.02.2009 | |
BE | 04.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.02.2009 | ||
DK | 04.02.2009 | ||
EE | 04.02.2009 | ||
FI | 04.02.2009 | ||
NL | 04.02.2009 | ||
PL | 04.02.2009 | ||
RO | 04.02.2009 | ||
SI | 04.02.2009 | ||
SK | 04.02.2009 | ||
BG | 04.05.2009 | ||
SE | 04.05.2009 | ||
ES | 15.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 04.02.2009 | |
BE | 04.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.02.2009 | ||
DK | 04.02.2009 | ||
EE | 04.02.2009 | ||
FI | 04.02.2009 | ||
NL | 04.02.2009 | ||
PL | 04.02.2009 | ||
RO | 04.02.2009 | ||
SI | 04.02.2009 | ||
SK | 04.02.2009 | ||
SE | 04.05.2009 | ||
ES | 15.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 04.02.2009 | |
BE | 04.02.2009 | ||
DK | 04.02.2009 | ||
FI | 04.02.2009 | ||
NL | 04.02.2009 | ||
PL | 04.02.2009 | ||
SI | 04.02.2009 | ||
SE | 04.05.2009 | ||
ES | 15.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 04.02.2009 | |
BE | 04.02.2009 | ||
FI | 04.02.2009 | ||
NL | 04.02.2009 | ||
PL | 04.02.2009 | ||
SI | 04.02.2009 | ||
SE | 04.05.2009 | ||
ES | 15.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 04.02.2009 | |
FI | 04.02.2009 | ||
NL | 04.02.2009 | ||
PL | 04.02.2009 | ||
SI | 04.02.2009 | ||
SE | 04.05.2009 | ||
ES | 15.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 04.02.2009 | |
NL | 04.02.2009 | ||
SI | 04.02.2009 | ||
ES | 15.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 04.02.2009 | |
ES | 15.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [YX]DE2129051 (KREUZER HORST, 4407 EMSDETTEN) [Y] 1-4 * page 6, line 6 - page 8, line 26; figures 1,2 * [X] 5; | [Y]DE9410031U (HUNTER DOUGLAS BENSHEIM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7 * figures 1-3 *; | [XY]EP0855477 (LINDNER AG [DE]) [X] 5,6 * column 2, line 14 - column 6, line 47; figures 1a,1b,2,4,6 * [Y] 1-4,7,8; | [Y]DE20011581U (FURAL GMBH VERTRIEB VON METALL [DE]) [Y] 8* abstract * |