EP1521451 - Image processing method, image processing device, image processing program, and printing control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsuyama, Kimito Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano / JP | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04023245.6 | 29.09.2004 | [2005/14] | Priority number, date | JP20030340077 | 30.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003340077 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1521451 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60, H04N1/405 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
H04N1/00005 (EP,US);
H04N1/00015 (EP,US);
H04N1/00031 (EP,US);
H04N1/00082 (EP,US);
H04N1/405 (EP,US);
H04N1/6011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsmethode, Bildverarbeitungsgerät, Bildverarbeitungsprogramm und Drucksteuerungsgerät | [2005/14] | English: | Image processing method, image processing device, image processing program, and printing control device | [2005/14] | French: | Procédé, dispositif et logiciel de traitement d'images et dispositif de commande d'impression | [2005/14] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |