EP1524569 - Duty cycle estimator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. Parker House Wildey Business Park Wildey Road St. Michael / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. Parker House, Wildey Business Park, Wildey Road St. Michael / BB | ||
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. Parker House, Wildey Business Park, Wildey Road St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sutardja, Sehat 27330 Elena Road Los Altos Hills CA 94022 / US | 02 /
He, Runsheng 874 Pecan Court Sunnyvale CA 94087 / US | 03 /
Zhang, Jiancheng 14696 Manuella Road Los Altos Hills CA 94022 / US | [2005/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04023247.2 | 10.07.2003 | [2005/16] | Priority number, date | US20030460825 | 12.06.2003 Original published format: US 460825 | US20020395697P | 12.07.2002 Original published format: US 395697 P | US20020395115P | 10.07.2002 Original published format: US 395115 P | [2005/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1524569 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1524569 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1524569 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/575, H02M3/335 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
H02M3/157 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/19] |
Former [2005/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tastverhältnisschätzer | [2005/16] | English: | Duty cycle estimator | [2005/16] | French: | Estimateur du rapport cyclique | [2005/16] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03763431.8 / EP1532501 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5949226 (TANAKA HIROTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,8-10 * column 10, line 50 - column 15, line 65; figures 8-10 *; | [A]WO0219507 (SYNQOR INC [US]) [A] 1,2* page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 27; figure 3 *; | [XA]US2002057080 (TELEFUS MARK D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10 * the whole document * [A] 3,7 |