EP1643658 - Power line communication method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Deutschland GmbH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2007/24] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Sony Deutschland GmbH Hugo-Eckener-Strasse 20 50829 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwager, Andreas, Sony Intern.(Eur)GmbH Stuttgart Technology Center Hedelfinger Strasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Stadelmeier, Lothar, Sony Intern.(Eur)GmbH Stuttgart Technology Center Hedelfinger Strasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Tiedemann, Stephen, Sony Intern.(Eur)GmbH Stuttgart Technology Center Hedelfinger Strasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
Gaedeken, Gralf, Sony Intern.(Eur)GmbH Stuttgart Technology Center Hedelfinger Strasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
Zumkeller, Markus, Sony Intern.(Eur)GmbH Stuttgart Technology Center Hedelfinger Strasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04023603.6 | 04.10.2004 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1643658 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/54 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
H04B3/542 (EP,US);
H04B15/005 (US);
H04B17/309 (US);
H04B3/54 (EP,US);
H04L27/2637 (US);
H04L5/0046 (EP,US);
H04L5/006 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5408 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5416 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5425 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5445 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5495 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/50] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NETZLEITUNGSÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/14] | English: | Power line communication method | [2006/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATIONS PAR COURANT PORTEUR | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 06.10.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/09] | 14.01.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/09] | Appeal following examination | 15.01.2014 | Appeal received No. T1150/14 | 22.04.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.01.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1014640 (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [X] 1-4,6,8-11,13-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0024] , [0025] , [0041] - [0053] *; | [X]US6249213 (HORNE DAVID M [US]) [X] 1-11,15-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 24 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 58 *; | [X]WO0165703 (INARI INC [US]) [X] 1-12,15-20 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 9 *; | [X]DE10026930 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-11,15-20 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2383724 (UNIV LANCASTER [GB]) [X] 1-4,6,8-11,13-20 * abstract * * page 7, line 17 - line 26 * * page 8, line 13 - page 9, line 25 *; | [X] - HALLDORSSON U R ET AL, "MODULATION FUER POWERLINE", FUNKSCHAU, FRANZIS-VERLAG K.G. MUNCHEN, DE, (19980306), vol. 71, no. 6, ISSN 0016-2841, pages 56,58 - 61, XP000774732 [X] 1-11,15-20 * the whole document * | Examination | US2004120249 |