Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
30.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
09.11.2007 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
06.11.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.09.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
18.09.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
31.05.2007 | Change: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
27.04.2007 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
13.10.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.07.2006 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
05.04.2006 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.01.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] |
18.01.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.06.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] |
29.04.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |