Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1541485 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2007 | B1 | EP1541485 | 15.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE20319158 | 11.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE380757T | 15.12.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE20319158 | 11.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE20319158U | 26.02.2004 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE20319158 | 11.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502004005695D1 | 24.01.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE20319158 | 11.12.2003 |