EP1541389 - Suspension control system and suspension control method for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Fumiharu Aisin Aw Co., Ltd. 6-18 Harayama Oka-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-8564 / JP | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024056.6 | 27.09.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | JP20030336127 | 26.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003336127 | JP20030346000 | 03.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003346000 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1541389 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1541389 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/015, B60G17/08 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
B60G17/0162 (EP);
B60G17/0195 (EP);
B60G17/08 (EP);
B60G2400/102 (EP);
B60G2400/41 (EP);
B60G2400/821 (EP);
B60G2400/824 (EP);
B60G2401/16 (EP);
B60G2500/10 (EP);
B60G2600/184 (EP);
B60G2800/162 (EP);
B60G2800/916 (EP);
B60W2556/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Regelung einer Fahrzeugaufhängung | [2005/24] | English: | Suspension control system and suspension control method for a vehicle | [2005/24] | French: | Système et procédé de commande d'une suspension de véhicule | [2005/24] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 01.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/15] | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04022941.1 / EP1518722 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH09114367 ; | [A]US5315295 (FUJII YUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1,14 * column 7, line 4 - line 15; figures 1,5 * * column 6, line 38 - line 50 *; | [A]US5369584 (KAJIWARA YASUYA [JP]) [A] 1,14 * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19600734 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0910057 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] - [0016]; figure . *; | [A]US6009374 (URAHASHI KAZUYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,14 * column 8, line 37 - line 67; figures 3,8 * * column 14, line 42 - column 15, line 4 * * column 16, line 2 - line 15 *; | [A]DE10060536 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10164481 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1288887 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,14 * paragraphs [0132] , [0138] - [0140] * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09114367 A 19970502 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [DA] 1,14 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH09114367 |