EP1493913 - Fuel gas mixer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iida, Yoshikatsu Yamaha Hatsudoki K. K. 2500 Shingai Iwata Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024215.8 | 12.10.2001 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | JP20000312048 | 12.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000312048 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493913 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1493913 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02M21/04, F02M41/00 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
F02D19/023 (EP,US);
F02M13/08 (EP,US);
F02M21/047 (EP,US);
F02D2009/0272 (EP,US);
F02M21/0212 (EP,US);
F02M21/0215 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/38] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mischer für gasförmige Brennstoffe | [2005/01] | English: | Fuel gas mixer | [2005/01] | French: | Mélangeur pour combustible gazeux | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01976674.0 / EP1331387 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.12.2005 | BE | 28.12.2005 | CH | 28.12.2005 | CY | 28.12.2005 | FI | 28.12.2005 | FR | 28.12.2005 | LI | 28.12.2005 | NL | 28.12.2005 | TR | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.03.2006 | GR | 28.03.2006 | SE | 28.03.2006 | DE | 29.03.2006 | ES | 08.04.2006 | PT | 29.05.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
TR | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
DE | 29.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
DE | 29.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
DE | 29.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
DE | 29.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP7189812 ; | [A]JPS52133815U (KABUSHIKI KAISHA NIPPON KIKAKI SEISAKUSHO) [A] 1-4 * figure - *; | [A]US4352677 (JONES JAMES S) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [A]SU1444551 (GO AUTOMOBILNY [SU]) [A] 1-4 * figure - *; | [A]EP0678662 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP7189812 A 19950728 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |