EP1591331 - Electric operating apparatus for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyoda Iron Works Co., Ltd. 4-50, Hosoya-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8507 / JP | [2015/52] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Toyoda Iron Works Co., Ltd. 4-50, Hosoya-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8507 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Noboru Toyoda Iron Works Co., Ltd. 4-50 Hosoya-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8507 / JP | 02 /
Hayashihara, Takashi Toyoda Iron Works Co., Ltd. 4-50 Hosoya-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8507 / JP | 03 /
Isono, Hiroshi Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2015/52] |
Former [2005/44] | 01 /
Fujiwara, Noboru Toyoda Iron Works Co., Ltd. 4-50 Hosoya-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8507 / JP | ||
02 /
Hayashihara, Takashi Toyoda Iron Works Co., Ltd. 4-50 Hosoya-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8507 / JP | |||
03 /
Isono, Hiroshi Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2015/52] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/44] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024307.3 | 12.10.2004 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | JP20040130381 | 26.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004130381 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1591331 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1591331 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05G1/00, B60T8/32, B60T7/04 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
B60T7/042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/44] | B60T8/32, B60T7/04, G05G1/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/52] |
Former [2006/27] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Betätigungseinrichtung für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2005/44] | English: | Electric operating apparatus for vehicle | [2005/44] | French: | Dispositif de commande électrique pour véhicules | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 25.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP2002308084 ; | [A]DE19832036 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [Y]DE10205037 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003160504 (CHRIS ANDERSON [FR]) [A] 3 * column 4, paragraph 62 - paragraph 71 * * column 4, paragraph 82 - column 5, paragraph 84; figure 3 * | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030205), vol. 2003, no. 02, & JP2002308084 A 20021023 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [YD] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * | Examination | GB2114717 | DE19848186 | US2003226937 | EP1375280 | EP1375232 | DE10250456 | by applicant | GB2114717 | DE19848186 | DE10205037 | DE10212674 | US2003226937 | EP1375280 | EP1375232 |