EP1529717 - Blocking device for an hydraulic rear axle steering of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Lenksysteme GmbH Richard-Bullinger-Strasse 77 73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2005/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stocker, Jürgen Adlersteige 6 73479 Ellwangen / DE | 02 /
Braun, Andreas Heubacher Strasse 70 73529 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | 03 /
Kogel, Walter Am Sonnenweg 8 73453 Abtsgmünd Neubronn / DE | [2005/19] | Application number, filing date | 04024468.3 | 14.10.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | DE2003151482 | 04.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10351482 | [2005/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1529717 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1529717 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529717 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/14 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
B62D7/148 (EP);
B62D7/144 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT, SE [2006/17] |
Former [2005/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Blockiervorrichtung für eine hydraulische Fahrzeug-Hinterachslenkung | [2005/19] | English: | Blocking device for an hydraulic rear axle steering of a vehicle | [2005/19] | French: | Dispositif de blocage pour direction hydraulique d'un essieu arrière de véhicule | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 04.02.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 01.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.03.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3615740 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * page 4, line 1 - page 15, line 23; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE3902810 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 4,5 * column 1, line 31 - column 3, line 49; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4953445 (KERVAGORET GILBERT [FR], et al) [A] 1-8* column 1, line 34 - column 6, line 25; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5086863 (TISCHER WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 18 - column 6, line 4; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE4204123 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 17 - line 41 * * column 2, line 1 - column 8, line 51; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE3615740 |