EP1528792 - Display device color channel reconstruction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [2013/27] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics, LLC 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arkady, Ten 1755 Farrington Street Roseville, MN 55113 / US | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024914.6 | 20.10.2004 | [2005/18] | Priority number, date | US20030695545 | 28.10.2003 Original published format: US 695545 | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1528792 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1528792 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1528792 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/02, H04N9/31, H04N1/60, H04N17/04 | [2013/07] | CPC: |
G09G5/02 (EP,US);
H04N1/603 (EP,US);
H04N17/04 (EP,US);
H04N9/3182 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0693 (EP,US);
H04N9/30 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/18] | H04N1/60, H04N9/73, H04N9/31 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2010/15] |
Former [2005/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Farbkanalrekonstruktion für ein Anzeigegerät | [2005/18] | English: | Display device color channel reconstruction | [2005/18] | French: | Reconstruction de voie de chrominance d'un dispositif d'affichage | [2005/18] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 06.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.07.2013 | [2014/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - GAURAV SHARMA, "LCDs Versus CRTs-Color-Calibration and Gamut Considerations", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (20020401), vol. 90, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9219, XP011064994 [A] 1-20 * Section VI. "Spectral Characterization" *;; figures 3-6 * | [A] - TAMURA N ET AL, "EVALUATION OF IMAGE QUALITY ON REFLECTIVE-TYPE LCD CALIBRATION BASED ON THE PCA", PROCEEDINGS. IS&T'S PICS CONFERENCE. ANNUAL CONFERENCE,PROCEEDINGS OF CONFERENCE OF THE SOCIETY FOR IMAGING SCIENCEAND TECHNOLOGY, XX, XX, (20010101), pages 366 - 371, XP008076628 [A] 1-20 * page 369 * | [A] - TAMURA N ET AL, "Masking model for accurate colometric characterization of LCD", JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION DISPLAY - SID, SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION DISPLAY, (20030101), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 1071-0922, pages 333 - 339, XP009072924 [A] * Sections 3.1 "Channel interaction" and 3.2 "Non-constancy of channel chromaticity" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1889/1.1825664 | [A] - YOSHIDA Y ET AL, "COLOR MANAGEMENT OF LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY PLACED UNDER LIGHT ENVIRONMENT", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART III - FUNDAMENTALELECTRONIC SCIENCE, WILEY, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (20030101), vol. 86, no. 7, PART 03, ISSN 1042-0967, pages 1 - 14, XP001144212 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ecjc.10074 | by applicant | - GAURAV SHARMA, "LCDs Versus CRTs-Color-Calibration and Gamut Considerations", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (20020401), vol. 90, no. 4 | - TAMURA N. ET AL., "EVALUATION OF IMAGE QUALITY ON REFLECTIVE_TYPE LCD CALIBRATION BASED ON THE PCA", IS&T'S PICS CONFERENCE, THE 54TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE SOCIETY FOR IMAGING SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (20010422), pages 366 - 371 |