EP1526050 - A pedal feel emulator mechanism for brake by wire pedal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dura Global Technologies, Inc. 2791 Research Drive Rochester Hills Michigan 48309 / US | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Dura Global Technologies, Inc. 2791 Research Drive Rochester Hills, Michigan 48309 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Constantakis, Crista M. 15768 Angelique Allen Park, MI 48101 / US | 02 /
Sundaresan, Srini 1707 Woodgate Dr. Troy MI 48083 / US | 03 /
Kiczek, Casmir R. 1068 Boulder Drive Gray GA 31032 / US | [2005/30] |
Former [2005/17] | 01 /
Constantakis, Crista M. 15768 Angelique Allen Park, MI 48101 / US | ||
02 /
Sundaresan, Srini 338 Woodside Court Rochester Hills MI 48307 / US | |||
03 /
Kiczek, Casmir R. 1068 Boulder Drive Gray GA 31032 / US | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04024972.4 | 20.10.2004 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | US20030512844P | 20.10.2003 Original published format: US 512844 P | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1526050 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1526050 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/04, B60T8/40 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
G05G1/38 (EP,US);
B60T17/02 (EP,US);
B60T7/042 (EP,US);
B60T8/3255 (EP,US);
G05G1/44 (EP,US);
G05G5/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2006/03] |
Former [2005/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bremskraftemulator für ein "brake by wire" Bremspedal | [2005/17] | English: | A pedal feel emulator mechanism for brake by wire pedal | [2005/17] | French: | Emulateur de pédale de frein pour un système de freinage "brake by wire" | [2006/38] |
Former [2005/17] | Emulateur de pédale de frein für une système à freinage "brake by wire" | Examination procedure | 05.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 28.10.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 13.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.12.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4324041 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 7,8,15 * claim 1 *; | [XY]US5544948 (SCHMIDT GUENTHER [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,7-25 * column 4, lines 2-4 * [Y] 2-4,6,26; | [X]US6058705 (SCHUNCK EBERHARDT [DE]) [X] 1,5,7-25* column 5, lines 18-47 *; | [DY]US6360631 (WORTMANN MARTIN [US], et al) [DY] 2-4,6,26 * abstract * |