EP1551013 - Optical pick-up actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Young Bok 16/1 Yeonmoo-dong 180-2, Jangan-gu Soowon-si Kyunggi-do / KR | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/27] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04025041.7 | 21.10.2004 | [2005/27] | Priority number, date | KR20030099180 | 29.12.2003 Original published format: KR 2003099180 | KR20040012683 | 25.02.2004 Original published format: KR 2004012683 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1551013 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1551013 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1551013 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09, G11B7/095 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
G11B7/0933 (EP,US);
G11B7/0956 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2007/39] |
Former [2005/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Positionierungsanordnung für einen optischen Abtastkopf | [2005/27] | English: | Optical pick-up actuator | [2005/27] | French: | Dispositif de positionnement d'une tête de lecture optique | [2005/27] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 25.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5136565 (OOYAMA NORIYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,11 * figure 4 *; | [XA]EP0650161 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * column 6, lines 10-32; figure 1 * * abstract * [A] 3,9; | [Y]JP2001184683 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-3,6-9 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033]; figure 4 *; | [Y]US2002003768 (PARK HEE JIN [KR], et al) [Y] 17 * paragraphs [0089] - [0091]; figure 13 *; | [Y]US2003039199 (NOGAMI TOYOSHI [JP]) [Y] 5,12 * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0022]; figure 4 *; | [YX]JP2003173557 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-9,11,12,15,17,19,20 * paragraphs [0050] - [0052]; figures 3,4 * [X] 10,13,14,16,18,21-23; | [Y]US2003161228 (WADA MITSUNORI [JP]) [Y] 15,17,19,20 * figures 2-7 *; | [A]US2003193854 (LEE HO-CHEOL [KR], et al) [A] 1-3,6-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003234457 (IJIMA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,6-9 * paragraph [0052]; figures 3,5 *; | [PX]EP1394784 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1,2,6-8* figures 3,9a,9b,10a,10b * |