EP1527905 - Self-orienting caster for moving pieces of furniture and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMILSIDER MECCANICA S.p.A. Via G. di Vittorio 17 40057 Cadriano di Granarolo Emilia (Prov. Bologna) / IT | [2009/32] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states EMILSIDER MECCANICA S.p.A. Via G. di Vittorio 17 40057 Cadriano di Granarolo Emilia (Prov. Bologna) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Melara, Francescantonio Via Galliera, 40 40121 Bologna / IT | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/18] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04025044.1 | 21.10.2004 | [2005/18] | Priority number, date | IT2003BO00112U | 28.10.2003 Original published format: IT BO20030112 U | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1527905 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1527905 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | [2006/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1527905 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60B33/00 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
B60B33/001 (EP,US);
B60B33/0002 (EP,US);
B60B33/0021 (EP,US);
B60B33/0042 (EP,US);
B60B33/0049 (EP,US);
B60B33/0057 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Title | German: | Selbstorientierende Rolle zur Umräumung von Möbelstücken und dergleichen | [2005/18] | English: | Self-orienting caster for moving pieces of furniture and the like | [2005/18] | French: | Roulette auto-orientable pour déplacer des meubles et objets similaires | [2005/18] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 27.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.08.2009 | BE | 05.08.2009 | CY | 05.08.2009 | DK | 05.08.2009 | EE | 05.08.2009 | FI | 05.08.2009 | NL | 05.08.2009 | RO | 05.08.2009 | SE | 05.08.2009 | SI | 05.08.2009 | SK | 05.08.2009 | TR | 05.08.2009 | IE | 21.10.2009 | LU | 21.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | BG | 05.11.2009 | GR | 06.11.2009 | PT | 05.12.2009 | HU | 06.02.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
LU | 21.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
HU | 06.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
LU | 21.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
SE | 05.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR636020 (BASSICK CO) [A] 1* figures 1,2,6-10 *; | [A]US2181722 (BUTTER RUSSELL A, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 34 - line 46 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5263238 (COOPER KENNETH E [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 4 - line 11 * * column 3, line 22 - line 28 * * column 4, line 30 - line 39 * * figures 1-12 * | by applicant | IT2003BO00112 |