EP1502591 - Controlled-release formulations coated with aqueous dispersions of ethylcellulose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. 2, avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | [2008/23] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. 122, Boulevard de la Pétrusse 2330 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshlack, Benjamin 351 East 84th Street New York, N.Y. 10028 / US | 02 /
Chasin, Mark 3 Turnberry Drive Monroe, NJ 08831 / US | 03 /
Pedi, Frank Jr. 2773 Hyatt Street Yorktown Heights New York, N.Y. 10598 / US | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04025136.5 | 14.06.1994 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | US19930081618 | 23.06.1993 Original published format: US 81618 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1502591 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1502591 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/485, A61K9/58 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
A61K9/167 (EP,US);
A61K47/38 (FI);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61K9/5078 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/05] | Extension states | SI | 22.10.2004 | Title | German: | Formulierungen mit kontrollierter Abgabe überzogen mit wässrigen Dispersionen von Ethylcellulose. | [2005/05] | English: | Controlled-release formulations coated with aqueous dispersions of ethylcellulose | [2005/05] | French: | Formulations à libération contrôlée enrobées avec dispersions aqueuses d'éthylcellulose. | [2005/05] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 22.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 17.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/17] | 11.11.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01130255.1 / EP1203581 | EP94109115.9 / EP0630646 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0271193 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU]) [Y] 1-8 * claims 1,5,6 *; | NZ241660 [ ] (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU]); | [PY]EP0548448 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU]) [PY] 1-8 * claims 15,20 * |