EP1550476 - Syringe with retractable needle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life-Shield Products, Inc. 3FL., No 10, Wuchiuan 7th Rd, Wugu Shiang Taipei / TW | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shih, Chao-Hua 3Fl., No. 10, Wuchiuan 7th Road Wugu Shiang Taipei / TW | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Ludgerus Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Meyer, Ludgerus A. Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04025250.4 | 23.10.2004 | [2005/27] | Priority number, date | US20030747053 | 30.12.2003 Original published format: US 747053 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1550476 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
A61M5/322 (EP,US);
A61M2005/31516 (EP,US);
A61M5/508 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | 02.01.2006 | HR | 02.01.2006 | LT | 02.01.2006 | LV | 02.01.2006 | MK | 02.01.2006 | Title | German: | Spritze mit zurückziehbarer Nadel | [2005/27] | English: | Syringe with retractable needle | [2005/27] | French: | Seringue avec aiguille rétractable | [2005/27] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/40] | 21.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3669111 (DUBNER BEN B) [A] 5-8* figures 6,7 *; | [X]EP0795338 (SAITO YOSHIKUNI [JP]) [X] 1,3,5-9 * column 39, line 29 - column 40, line 50; figure 14 *; | [X]DE29818132U (BROCKHAUS ROLF DR [DE]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0979660 (SAITO YOSHIKUNI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 4; | [A]DE20303231U (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [A] 5-8 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US6613016 (KU JEN CHUAN [TW]) [Y] 4 * figures 6,7 * |