blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1529836

EP1529836 - Cell treating chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2009
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.03.2009  [2009/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EPPENDORF AG
Barkhausenweg 1
22339 Hamburg / DE
[2005/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Huhn, Rüdiger
Damaschkestrasse 9
23560 Lübeck / DE
 [2005/19]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2005/19]Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg
Neuer Wall 41
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date04025370.026.10.2004
[2005/19]
Priority number, dateDE200315183306.11.2003         Original published format: DE 10351833
[2005/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1529836
Date:11.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1529836
Date:09.04.2008
Language:DE
[2008/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2005
ClassificationIPC:C12M3/00
[2005/19]
CPC:
C12M35/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/05]
Former [2005/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zellbehandlungskammer[2005/19]
English:Cell treating chamber[2005/19]
French:Chambre de traitement de cellules[2005/19]
Examination procedure16.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/24]
05.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
15.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2008Fee for grant paid
29.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4764473  (MATSCHKE CHRISTAIN [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,4,6,15 * column 5, line 35 - line 65; figure 1; claims 1,3-8 *;
 [A]DE8813314U  (ERNO RAUMFAHRTTECHNIK) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19917571  (POPPE ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.