EP1529512 - Bath tub with foil wrap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haslauer, Paul Moosstrasse 103 4020 Salzburg / AT | [2005/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/19] | Flach, Dieter Dipl.-Ing, et al Andrae Flach Haug Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04025650.5 | 28.10.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | DE2003151770 | 06.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10351770 | [2005/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1529512 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1529512 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61H23/04, A61H33/04 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
A61H33/04 (EP,US);
A61H9/00 (EP);
A61H9/0021 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1654 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Title | German: | Mit einer Folie ausgelegte Badewanne | [2005/19] | English: | Bath tub with foil wrap | [2005/19] | French: | Baignoire à double paroi souple | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 22.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/34] | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4106133 (ROBERTS THOMAS J) [X] 1,3 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE2911758 (MUTZHAS MAXIMILIAN F) [X] 9,14,17 * page 7, line 6 - line 11 * * page 10, line 26 - line 27 * * figure - *; | [DA]DE3046628 (HASLAUER PAUL [AT]) [DA] 2* the whole document *; | [X]EP0448966 (HASLAUER PAUL [AT]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 19 - line 32; figure - * | by applicant | DE3046628 | EP0144571 |