EP1522739 - Apparatus for outputting compressed air with a compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/52] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murayama, Keijiro c/o Max Co., Ltd. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Murayama, Katsuhiko c/o Max Co., Ltd. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hanagasaki, Hiroshi c/o Max Co., Ltd. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kuraguchi, Kazuhiko c/o Max Co., Ltd. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Takemura, Hajime c/o Max Co., Ltd. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Turi, Michael, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | Turi, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04025749.5 | 07.03.2002 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | JP20010063830 | 07.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001063830 | JP20010063831 | 07.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001063831 | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1522739 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1522739 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/028, F15B11/16 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
F15B11/16 (EP,US);
B25B21/00 (EP,US);
F15B11/028 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20538 (EP,US);
F15B2211/212 (EP,US);
F15B2211/40515 (EP,US);
F15B2211/426 (EP,US);
F15B2211/45 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50554 (EP,US);
F15B2211/5151 (EP,US);
F15B2211/523 (EP,US);
F15B2211/55 (EP,US);
F15B2211/625 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6309 (EP,US);
F15B2211/7052 (EP,US);
F15B2211/71 (EP,US);
Y10T137/5109 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7728 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7869 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8593 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86035 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/01] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Druckluftversorgungsgerät mit einem Verdichter | [2005/15] | English: | Apparatus for outputting compressed air with a compressor | [2005/15] | French: | Dispositif pour alimenter de l'air sous pression avec un compresseur | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 30.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02005123.1 / EP1239165 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH04298691 ; | [A]US4579042 (NEFF JAMES A [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5562121 (HODGES STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19515895 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 20 - line 34; figure 1 * * column 8, line 24 - line 38 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930308), vol. 017, no. 111, Database accession no. (M - 1376), & JP04298691 A 19921022 (HITACHI KOKI) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH04298691 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 017, no. 111 |