EP1530167 - Method and system for a mailing machine to verify the integrity of printed postage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nambudiri, Easwaran 9 Castleview Court Rye Brook CT 10573 / US | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04025765.1 | 29.10.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | US20030698150 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: US 698150 | [2005/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1530167 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1530167 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/02 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
G07B17/00467 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00483 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00588 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00717 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/17] |
Former [2005/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Frankiermaschine mit zugehörigem Verfahren und Anordnung zum Überprüfen der Richtigkeit des aufgedruckten Portos | [2005/19] | English: | Method and system for a mailing machine to verify the integrity of printed postage | [2005/19] | French: | Machine à affranchir comportant un procédé et système pour verifier l'intégrité des marques d'affranchissement | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 22.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0331352 (ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS [GB], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 35 - column 6, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5917925 (MOORE LEWIS J [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 8 - column 6, line 14 *; | [X]US2002088866 (DLUGOS DANIEL F [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053]; figure 8 *; | [X]GB2376332 (POST OFFICE [GB], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 36, line 21 - page 42, line 14 * * figures 15,16 *; | [X]WO03044620 (PSI SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 13-16 * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 15 *; | [L] - "Information Based Indicia Program (IBIP) Indicium Specification", INFORMATION BASED INDICIA PROGRAM (IBIP) INDICIUM SPECIFICATION, (19960613), page COMPLETE23, XP002137735 [L] * the whole document * | [L] - "Information Based Indicia Program Host System Specification", INFORMATION BASED INDICIA PROGRAM HOST SYSTEM SPECIFICATION, (19961009), page complete42, XP002142880 [L] * the whole document * |