EP1529868 - Drum type washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inuzuka, Tadashi 3-40-13, Shirogane Inagawa-cho Kawabe-gun Hyogo 666-0257 / JP | 02 /
Saito, Katsuya 1-2-11-711, Shinden Kawanishi-shi Hyogo 666-0125 / JP | 03 /
Fukuda, Tsuyoshi 1-7-11-1404, Shonaihigashinmachi Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0831 / JP | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/19] | Turi, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04026162.0 | 04.11.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | JP20030378123 | 07.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003378123 | [2005/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1529868 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1529868 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/22 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
D06F23/06 (EP,KR,US);
D06F37/22 (EP,KR,US);
D06F37/20 (EP);
D06F39/125 (KR);
F16F15/022 (KR);
Y02B40/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2005/19] | D06F37/20, D06F23/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Title | German: | Trommelwaschmaschine | [2005/19] | English: | Drum type washing machine | [2005/19] | French: | Machine à laver à tambour | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 27.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 15.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1268597 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-4; | [XA]GB2067603 (HOTPOINT LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] ; | [XA]JPH0584388 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-4; | [AD]JPH06327892 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al) [AD] 1-4* the whole document *; | [XA]JP2001224893 (SHARP KK) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [A] 2,3 |