blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1530290

EP1530290 - Piezoelectric device, antenna duplexer, and method of manufacturing piezoelectric resonators used therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/19]Piezoelectric device, antenna duplexer, and method of manufacturing piezolelectric resonators used therefor
[2005/37]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.06.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.06.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.08.2006  [2006/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/19]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakamura, Hiroyuki
4-3-1-206, Hoshida
Katano-shi Osaka-fu 576-0016 / JP
02 / Onishi, Keiji
2-2-10, Hitotsuya
Settsu-shi Osaka-fu 566-0043 / JP
03 / Nakatsuka, Hiroshi
6-5-301, Myokenzaka
Katano-shi Osaka-fu 576-0021 / JP
04 / Yamaguchi, Hiroshi
3-8-401, Myokenzaka
Katano-shi Osaka-fu 576-0021 / JP
05 / Yamakawa, Takehiko
14-1-611, Hoshigaoka
Senriyama Suita-shi Osaka-fu 565-0845 / JP
 [2005/19]
Representative(s)Gassner, Wolfgang
Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Marie-Curie-Strasse 1
91052 Erlangen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/19]Gassner, Wolfgang, Dr.
Patentanwalt, Nägelsbachstrasse 49a
91052 Erlangen / DE
Application number, filing date04026165.304.11.2004
[2005/19]
Priority number, dateJP2003037825807.11.2003         Original published format: JP 2003378258
[2005/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1530290
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
ClassificationIPC:H03H3/02, H03H9/58
[2005/19]
CPC:
H03H9/605 (EP,US); H10N30/00 (KR); H03H3/02 (EP,US);
H03H9/02118 (EP,US); H03H9/587 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Piezoelektrische Vorrichtung, Antennenweiche und Herstellungsverfahren des piezoelektrischen Resonators dafür[2005/19]
English:Piezoelectric device, antenna duplexer, and method of manufacturing piezoelectric resonators used therefor[2005/37]
French:Dispositif piezoélectrique, duplexeur d'antenne et méthode de production des résonateurs piezoélectriques utilisés à cet effet[2005/19]
Former [2005/19]Piezoelectric device, antenna duplexer, and method of manufacturing piezolelectric resonators used therefor
Examination procedure31.05.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/31]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.