EP1529452 - Shirts having neck size adjusting function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kato, Koji 189, Takehana-cho Hashima-shi Gifu-ken, 501-6241 / JP | [2010/26] |
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states Kato, Koji 189, Takehana-cho Hashima-shi, Gifu-ken, 501-6241 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/19] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04026228.9 | 04.11.2004 | [2005/19] | Priority number, date | JP20030374174 | 04.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003374174 | JP20030381648 | 11.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003381648 | JP20040007829 | 15.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004007829 | JP20040130611 | 27.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004130611 | JP20040140826 | 11.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004140826 | JP20040292584 | 05.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004292584 | [2005/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1529452 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1529452 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529452 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A41B1/16 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
A41B1/16 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A41B1/22 (KR);
A41B3/02 (KR);
A41B3/04 (KR);
A41D27/18 (KR);
A41B2300/326 (KR);
A41B2300/332 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2006/30] |
Former [2005/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hemden mit Kragengrösseverstellungsfunktion | [2005/19] | English: | Shirts having neck size adjusting function | [2005/19] | French: | Chemises à fonction de règlage de la taille du col | [2005/19] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE240147 ; | [A]DE114484 ; | [A]GB191024459 (VINEBERG JOSEPH HIRSCH [CA]); | [A]US1569988 (LAND ALBERT W); | [X]US1603482 (MARQUISEE JESSE R); | [X]US1616258 (HAMILTON ELMER W); | [A]DE489320 (ALEXANDER BODENHEIMER); | [A]US1789422 (IDA ASKEY, et al); | [X]DE549832 (FRITZ BEINHOFF); | [A]GB387708 (ADESS AND SON LTD); | [A]GB468299 (CLIFFORD WALSH); | [A]DE8218346U ; | [X]DE20007322U (BOCK HELMUT W [DE]) |