EP1533333 - Emulsifier-free oil-in-water type emulsions of organopolysiloxanes and their use in technical applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Goldschmidt GmbH Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | [2007/48] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Goldschmidt GmbH Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gippert, Michael Hofringstrasse 8 45138 Essen / DE | 02 /
Schnelle, Ralf, Dr. Graf-Bernadotte-Strasse 30 45133 Essen / DE | 03 /
Silber, Stefan, Dr. Meisenweg 37 47804 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
Sucker, Roland Am Bellingholz 2b 59368 Werne / DE | 05 /
Wolfgram, Dirk Eiberger Strasse 50 44879 Bochum / DE | [2005/21] | Application number, filing date | 04026342.8 | 05.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | DE2003153856 | 18.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10353856 | [2005/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533333 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1533333 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/46, C08G77/38, B01D19/04 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
B01D19/0409 (EP,US);
C08G77/38 (EP,US);
C08G77/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Title | German: | Emulgatorfreie Öl in Wasser-Emulsionen von Organopolysiloxanen und deren Verwendung in technischen Anwendungen | [2005/21] | English: | Emulsifier-free oil-in-water type emulsions of organopolysiloxanes and their use in technical applications | [2005/21] | French: | Emulsions à base d'organopolysiloxanes du type huile dans eau exemptés d'émulsifiants et leurs utilisation dans des applications techniques | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 15.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.02.2008 | CZ | 27.02.2008 | EE | 27.02.2008 | FI | 27.02.2008 | IE | 27.02.2008 | PL | 27.02.2008 | RO | 27.02.2008 | SI | 27.02.2008 | SK | 27.02.2008 | TR | 27.02.2008 | BG | 27.05.2008 | GR | 28.05.2008 | ES | 07.06.2008 | IS | 27.06.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | HU | 28.08.2008 | AT | 05.11.2008 | LU | 05.11.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
TR | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
AT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LU | 05.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 28.08.2008 | ||
AT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LU | 05.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
AT | 05.11.2008 | ||
LU | 05.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
AT | 05.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 27.02.2008 | |
CZ | 27.02.2008 | ||
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
BG | 27.05.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
EE | 27.02.2008 | ||
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 27.02.2008 | |
FI | 27.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
RO | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
SK | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
SI | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
PL | 27.02.2008 | ||
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 27.02.2008 | |
ES | 07.06.2008 | ||
IS | 27.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4028218 (FINK HANS-FERDI, et al) [X] 1-7 * examples 1-6; claims 1-10 * [Y] 1-7; | [Y]DE3427496 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * claims 1-5 *; | [XY]DE3938109 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * page 4, line 60 - page 7; examples 1-6; claims 1-3 * [Y] 1-7; | [XY]US5804099 (HEILEN WERNFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 33; claim 3 * [Y] 1-7; | [Y]US2003124158 (HEIDENFELDER THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7* paragraph [0160] * |