05.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
20.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
23.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
09.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
24.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
01.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
02.01.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] |
14.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
13.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
12.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
24.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
26.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
19.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
22.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
01.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
25.01.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
04.01.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.01.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
11.07.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.09.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.05.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.12.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 15.02.2006 [2006/07] |
08.04.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] |
08.04.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] |