EP1513348 - Program reception/execution apparatus that can commence execution of a machine program having only received the program in part, and a program transmission apparatus that enables such execution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Shinji 9-13-306 Higashiikourien-cho Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-0081 / JP | 02 /
Oashi, Masahiro 61-6, Tanabe Doujyo Kyotanabe-shi Kyoto 610-0331 / JP | 03 /
Kusumi, Yuki 15-40, Sekiyakita 3-chome Kashiba-shi Nara 639-02 / JP | 04 /
Shimoji, Tatsuya 30-3-1102, Miiminamimachi Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572 / JP | 05 /
Minamikata, Ikuo 34-3, Sakuragaoka 2-chome Seikacho Souraku-gun Kyoto 6 19-02 / JP | 06 /
Kozuka, Masayuki 19-1-1207, Ishizuminamimachi Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572 / JP | 07 /
Mimura, Yoshihiro 62/4 Great King Street Edinburgh Scotland EH3 6QY / GB | 08 /
Miyabe, Yoshiyuki 9-11-505 Higashimikuni 3-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 532 / JP | 09 /
Okamura, Kazuo 3-6-118-503 Shinsenrihigashi-machi Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0082 / JP | 10 /
Kakiuchi, Takashi 10-7, Kitajoucho 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561 / JP | 11 /
Hirai, Junichi 20-8-503, Yamatecho 2-chome Suita-shi Osaka 564 / JP | 12 /
Takao, Naoya 1-1-3-1013 Maya Kaigan-dori Nada-ku Kobe-shi 657-0855 / JP | 13 /
Mori, Toshiya 1-6-19 Shinzaike Settu-shi Osaka 566-0055 / JP | [2005/18] |
Former [2005/10] | 01 /
Inoue, Shinji 19-1-1142, Matsuyacho Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572 / JP | ||
02 /
Oashi, Masahiro 43-22, Nomuramotomachi Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-01 / JP | |||
03 /
Kusumi, Yuki 15-40, Sekiyakita 3-chome Kashiba-shi Nara 639-02 / JP | |||
04 /
Shimoji, Tatsuya 30-3-1102, Miiminamimachi Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572 / JP | |||
05 /
Minamikata, Ikuo 34-3, Sakuragaoka 2-chome Seikacho Souraku-gun Kyoto 6 19-02 / JP | |||
06 /
Kozuka, Masayuki 19-1-1207, Ishizuminamimachi Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572 / JP | |||
07 /
Mimura, Yoshihiro 2-22-5 13, Takatsukacho Hirakata-shi Osaka 573 / JP | |||
08 /
Miyabe, Yoshiyuki 9-11-505 Higashimikuni 3-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 532 / JP | |||
09 /
Okamura, Kazuo 5-8-302, Hoshigaoka 4-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka 573 / JP | |||
10 /
Kakiuchi, Takashi 10-7, Kitajoucho 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561 / JP | |||
11 /
Hirai, Junichi 20-8-503, Yamatecho 2-chome Suita-shi Osaka 564 / JP | |||
12 /
Takao, Naoya 16-3-7 12, Joushoujicho Kadoma-shi Osaka 571 / JP | |||
13 /
Mori, Toshiya 7-5-603, Sinzaike 1-chome Settsu-shi Osaka 566 / JP | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 04026784.1 | 08.09.1997 | [2005/10] | Priority number, date | JP19960240296 | 11.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24029696 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513348 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N7/16, H04N5/00 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
G06F9/44521 (EP,US);
H04N7/08 (KR);
G06F8/61 (EP,US);
H04N21/234318 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/23614 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/47815 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99945 (US);
Y10S707/99948 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/10] | Title | German: | Maschine für Programmempfang und -ausführung, die auch bei teilweisem Empfang des Programms die Maschinenprogrammausführung startet | [2005/10] | English: | Program reception/execution apparatus that can commence execution of a machine program having only received the program in part, and a program transmission apparatus that enables such execution | [2005/10] | French: | Appareil de réception/exécution de programme pouvant commencer l'exécution d'un programme même lorsque seulement une partie du programme est reçue | [2005/10] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 30.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/50] | Appeal following examination | 05.12.2006 | Appeal received No. T0397/07 | 12.02.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.10.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03075061.6 / EP1331560 | EP97939205.7 / EP0866612 | Divisional application(s) | EP07001709.0 / EP1786211 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2008 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5440632 (BACON KINNEY C [US], et al) [X] 2 * column 9, line 25 - column 10, line 50 *; | [XY]EP0680213 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [X] 2 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 3 * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 9 * * column 6, line 9 - column 7, line 9 * * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 29 * * column 9, line 21 - column 13, line 8 * * column 14, line 28 - line 34 * [Y] 1; | [XY]EP0680185 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [X] 2 * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 17 * * column 6, line 36 - line 58 * * column 13, line 29 - column 14, line 28 * [Y] 1; | [A]WO9533338 (BELL ATLANTIC NETWORK SERVICES [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 8, line 8 - page 10, line 3 ** page 17, line 13 - page 18, line 16 *; | [A]EP0690400 (RCA THOMSON LICENSING CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 6, line 39 - page 7, line 26 * |