EP1533060 - Lock set installation apparatus and kit and method of using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states BLACK & DECKER INC. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snider, Gregory S. 207 Woodland Drive Bel Air, Maryland 21014 / US | 02 /
Pangerc, James E. 2606 IVY Place Baltimore, Maryland 21234 / US | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2005/21] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker, 210 Bath Road Slough, Berks SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04026839.3 | 11.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | US20030712862 | 13.11.2003 Original published format: US 712862 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1533060 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1533060 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23B47/28 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
C02F3/341 (EP,US);
B23B47/287 (EP,US);
B27F5/12 (EP,US);
E05B17/06 (EP,US);
C02F2101/305 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Installation einer Schlossgarnitur, Werkzeugsatz und Verfahren zur Verwendung der Vorrichtung | [2005/21] | English: | Lock set installation apparatus and kit and method of using same | [2005/21] | French: | Dispositif d'installation d'une garniture de serrure, kit et procédé d'utilisation dudit dispositif | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 29.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2763299 (CERF JR ROBERT C) [DA] 1-15 * column 1, paragraph 1 ** figures 2,4 *; | [A]US3021734 (SCHLAGE ERNEST L) [A] 1-15 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4248554 (BOUCHER AUGUST S, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US6398465 (MONGE VALERY [US]) [DA] 1-15 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-23 * | by applicant | US2763299 | US4248554 | US6398465 |