EP1545086 - Method for policy-based firewall service management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Qian, Tin 17420 NE 11th Street Bellevue Washington 98008 / US | 02 /
Gavrilescu, Alexandru 23203 NE 78th Way Redmond Washington 90853 / US | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04026873.2 | 11.11.2004 | [2005/25] | Priority number, date | US20030740748 | 19.12.2003 Original published format: US 740748 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1545086 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1545086 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
H04L63/0227 (EP,US);
H04L12/22 (KR);
H04L63/0263 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2113 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur regelbasierten Firewalldiensteverwaltung | [2005/25] | English: | Method for policy-based firewall service management | [2005/25] | French: | Procédé pour la gestion des services d'un pare-feu à base de règles | [2005/25] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 15.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 05.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0078004 (ALCATEL INTERNETWORKING INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 14, line 19 - page 16, line 7 * * page 16, line 21 - page 17, line 24 * * page 21, line 34 - page 22, line 14 * * figures 1-4,19 *; | [X]US2002138726 (SAMES DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0061] * * figures 1-3,6,7 *; | [XA]WO02078240 (SECURIFY INC [US]) [X] 7-31 * abstract * * page 11, line 13 - page 12, line 9 * * page 40, lines 19-23 * * page 60, line 26 - page 61, line 2 * * page 69, line 8 - page 73, line 19 * * page 94, line 16 - page 97, line 15 * * page 100, line 17 - page 102, line 20 * * figures 1,6 * [A] 1-6; | [XA]WO02080457 (SPHERE SOFTWARE CORP [US]) [X] 7-31 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0057] * * paragraph [0088] * * figures 3-7 *[A] 1-6; | [A] - HUNT R, "Internet/Intranet firewall security-policy, architecture and transaction services", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, BUTTERWORTHS & CO. PUBLISHERS LTD, GB, (19980901), vol. 21, no. 13, ISSN 0140-3664, pages 1107 - 1123, XP004146571 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 1109, left-hand column, section 1.3 - page 1109, right-hand column, section 1.4 * * page 1113, right-hand column, section 2.2 - page 1114, left-hand column, section 2.2.1 * * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-3664(98)00173-X |