EP1545087 - Apparatus and method for a world wide web-based directory with automatic call capability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2005/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watts, Ronald Franklin 1529 Waterford Drive 75077 Lewisville Texas / US | 02 /
Dyer, William 8009 Mountain Ridge Drive 75025 Plano Texas / US | 03 /
Kadakia, Mitul B. 4521 Burnhill Drive Plano, Texas 75025 / US | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04027266.8 | 17.11.2004 | [2005/25] | Priority number, date | US20030736958 | 16.12.2003 Original published format: US 736958 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1545087 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/12 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
H04M7/003 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L61/4535 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP);
H04L65/4038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/11] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für ein Web-basiertes Verzeichnis mit Fähigkeit des automatischen Anrufs | [2005/25] | English: | Apparatus and method for a world wide web-based directory with automatic call capability | [2005/25] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour un annuaire basé sur le web avec des possibilités d'appel automatique | [2005/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/37] | 26.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.02.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.02.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.02.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6185194 (MUSK ELON [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * figure 3 * * column 3, line 9 - column 6, line 26 *; | [X]US6249576 (SASSIN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2 - column 8 *; | [X]US2002054671 (WIENER VICTOR [AU], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0083] *; | [X]US6430282 (BANNISTER CECIL H [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 35 - column 13, line 54 *; | [X]US2002114318 (RINES CLARK C [US]) [X] 1-10* paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0036] *; | [X]WO03028357 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 21 - page 7, line 11 * |