EP1533815 - 3D RRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, Sheng, Teng 2216 NW Trout Court Camas, WA 98607 / US | [2008/28] |
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
Hsu, Sheng, Teng 2216 NW Trout Court Camas WA 98607 / US | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04027767.5 | 23.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | US20030720890 | 24.11.2003 Original published format: US 720890 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1533815 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1533815 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/24 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
G11C13/0007 (EP,KR,US);
H10B63/00 (EP,KR,US);
G11C2213/31 (EP,KR,US);
G11C2213/77 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/21] | G11C16/02, H01L27/22, H01L45/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/11] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | 3D RRAM | [2005/21] | English: | 3D RRAM | [2005/21] | French: | 3D RRAM | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 06.01.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.02.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.02.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5825685 (YAMANE HARUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US6130835 (SCHEUERLEIN ROY EDWIN [US]); | [A]US2002012267 (OKAZAWA TAKESHI [JP]); | [A]US6583003 (HSU SHENG TENG [US], et al); | [A]US2003206481 (HSU SHENG TENG [US], et al) | Examination | US6185122 |