EP1533767 - Wireless asset monitoring and security system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2007/02] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states BLACK & DECKER INC. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Puzio, Daniel 2713 Bauernwood Avenue Baltimore Maryland 21234 / US | 02 /
Milburn, Lawrence E. 628 Camelot Drive Bel Air Maryland 21015 / US | 03 /
Watts, Fred S. 15301 Boundary Drive New Freedom Pennsylvania 17349 / US | 04 /
Mooney, Charles P. 660 Colonial Drive Dallastown Pennsylvania 17313 / US | 05 /
Bradus, Robert 904 Clymer Court Bel Air Maryland 21015 / US | 06 /
Watson, James 2600 Claret Drive Fallston Maryland 21047 / US | 07 /
Pugh, William E. II 515 Overbrook Road Baltimore Maryland 21212 / US | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2005/21] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker, 210 Bath Road Slough, Berks SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04027853.3 | 24.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | US20030524811P | 24.11.2003 Original published format: US 524811 P | US20030524822P | 24.11.2003 Original published format: US 524822 P | US20030524829P | 24.11.2003 Original published format: US 524829 P | US20040626758P | 11.11.2004 Original published format: US 626758 P | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533767 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1533767 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14, G08B13/24 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
G08B21/0275 (EP,US);
B25F5/00 (EP);
G08B13/14 (EP,US);
G08B13/1427 (EP,US);
G08B13/2454 (EP,US);
G08B13/2462 (EP,US);
G08B21/0225 (EP,US);
G08B21/0227 (EP,US);
G08B21/0261 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Title | German: | Drahtloses Überwachungs- und Sicherheitssystem für Güter | [2005/21] | English: | Wireless asset monitoring and security system | [2005/21] | French: | Système de surveillance et de sécurité sans fil pour des biens | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 14.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2007 | CH | 10.01.2007 | CY | 10.01.2007 | CZ | 10.01.2007 | DK | 10.01.2007 | EE | 10.01.2007 | FI | 10.01.2007 | LI | 10.01.2007 | NL | 10.01.2007 | RO | 10.01.2007 | SI | 10.01.2007 | SK | 10.01.2007 | TR | 10.01.2007 | BG | 11.04.2007 | GR | 11.04.2007 | IS | 10.05.2007 | PT | 11.06.2007 | HU | 11.07.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/35] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CY | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
IS | 10.05.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
EE | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
IS | 10.05.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
GR | 11.04.2007 | ||
IS | 10.05.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
RO | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
IS | 10.05.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
IS | 10.05.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
SK | 10.01.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
IS | 10.05.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 10.01.2007 | |
CH | 10.01.2007 | ||
DK | 10.01.2007 | ||
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
SI | 10.01.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
IS | 10.05.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CH | 10.01.2007 | |
FI | 10.01.2007 | ||
LI | 10.01.2007 | ||
NL | 10.01.2007 | ||
BG | 11.04.2007 | ||
IS | 10.05.2007 | ||
PT | 11.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6232877 (ASHWIN TERRENCE KEITH [ZA]) [X] 1-7,9,18,28 * abstract * * column 5, lines 39-63 * * column 6, lines 15-19 * * column 6, lines 20-40 ** column 6, lines 50-56; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO0245029 (ATLANTES SERVICES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,14,22,23,30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0018] , [0020] , [0026] - [0029] - [0031] , [0032]; figure 1; claim 11 *; | [X]US2002153418 (MALONEY WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 1-10,13,15,17,18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0026] , [0031] - [0034] - [0039] , [0045] , [0052] , [0061] , [0063] *; | [A]US6577238 (WHITESMITH HOWARD WILLIAM [GB], et al) [A] 11,12 * abstract * * column 2, lines 4-7 * * column 2, lines 23-31 * * column 2, lines 52-55 * * figure 1 *; | [X]GB2387744 (SNITCH LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,7,9,13,15,16 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - page 14, line 3 * * page 25, lines 1-13; figures 1-4 * |