EP1547995 - Process for the preparation of carboxylic acid esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Souda, Hiroshi 2-10-1-155, Sonehigashino-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Iwakura, Kazunori 4-2-8-1006, Tamai-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka / JP | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/26] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04027864.0 | 24.11.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | JP20030395147 | 26.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003395147 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1547995 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1547995 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/08, C07C69/747, C07F7/00 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
C07C67/08 (EP,KR,US);
B01J31/0212 (EP,US);
C07F7/003 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/08, C07C69/747 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, HU, IT [2006/12] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Carbonsäureestern | [2005/26] | English: | Process for the preparation of carboxylic acid esters | [2005/26] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'esters d'acides carboxyliques | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07003509.2 / EP1792889 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2004 | GB | 24.11.2014 | FR | 01.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/51] | GB | 24.11.2014 | |
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | GB | 24.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4374760 (CHARLES HAROLD [US]) [X] 17-19,21 * table 2, compound Y 1. *; | JPH06340870 [ ] (NIPPON SODA CO); | [A]EP1227077 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document, in particular examples 1-18 *; | JP2002293759 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1995:392464, URL: STN, XP002318513 [X] 15-19,22 * abstract; RN163114-32-7 * | [X] - A. SHAH ET AL, INDIAN J. CHEM., SECT. A, (1993), vol. 32A, no. 7, pages 632 - 635, XP008043540 [X] 15,16,21,22 * page 632, right-hand column, lines 18-29; page 633, left-hand column, compounds 8-15 * | [X] - S.C. GOEL, SYNTHESIS AND REACTIVITY IN INORGANIC AND METAL-ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1985), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 533 - 544, XP008043618 [X] 15,16,22 * page 538, table I, 5th entry * | [X] - R.C. MEHROTRA ET AL, INDIAN J. CHEM., (1973), vol. 11, no. 8, pages 814 - 816, XP008043541 [X] 15,16,22 * page 815, table 1, 4th entry * |