EP1619894 - Digital broadcast receiving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ui, Shunji c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1,Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04027985.3 | 25.11.2004 | [2006/04] | Priority number, date | JP20040213312 | 21.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004213312 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619894 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/088, H04N7/025 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
H04N21/8543 (EP);
G10L13/00 (EP);
H04H20/28 (EP);
H04H40/18 (EP);
H04H60/27 (EP);
H04H60/68 (EP);
H04N21/41422 (EP);
H04N21/4348 (EP);
H04N21/435 (EP);
H04N21/439 (EP);
H04N21/440236 (EP);
H04N21/47 (EP);
H04N21/84 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/39] |
Former [2006/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Digitalrundfunkempfangsanlage | [2006/04] | English: | Digital broadcast receiving apparatus | [2006/04] | French: | Appareil de réception de radiodiffusion numérique | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2004 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 04.08.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH1183522 ; | [A]JPH07203392 ; | [A]JPH05313565 ; | [A]US5845248 (NISHIDA HIDEHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 4, line 30 - column 16, line 17 *; | [YA]EP1182644 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3,10 * the whole document * [A] 4-9,11-13 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11083522 A 19990326 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-3,10 * abstract * [A] 4-9,11-13 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07203392 A 19950804 (NEC ENG LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940303), vol. 018, no. 129, Database accession no. (P - 1703), & JP05313565 A 19931126 (SHARP CORP) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |