EP1535565 - Insertion auxiliary implement for an endoscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2010/40] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takemoto, Shotaro 38, Nando-machi, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04027992.9 | 25.11.2004 | [2005/22] | Priority number, date | JP20030397377 | 27.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003397377 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535565 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1535565 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/01, A61B1/273 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
A61B1/00154 (EP,US);
A61B1/00066 (EP,US);
A61B1/00137 (EP,US);
A61B1/0014 (EP,US);
A61B1/273 (EP,US);
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B17/3462 (EP,US);
A61B17/3498 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00296 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2006/08] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einführvorrichtung für ein Endoskop | [2005/22] | English: | Insertion auxiliary implement for an endoscope | [2005/22] | French: | Dispositif d'insertion pour un endoscope | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH07163516 ; | [X]US5846182 (WOLCOTT KENNETH E [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 5, lines 23-57 * * column 7, lines 38-48 * * figures 3-5,10 *; | [A]US6517549 (DENNIS WILLIAM G [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 28; figure 7 *; | [X]US2003135091 (NAKAZAWA MASAAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0111] - [0113] - [0117] , [0133]; figures 4a-4f,6,7,10a * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07163516 A 19950627 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO LTD) [DA] 1,2 * abstract * |