EP1568367 - Compounds effecting glucokinase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | (Expected) limited patent specification | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2005/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnstone, Craig AstraZeneca R&D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 02 /
James, Roger AstraZeneca R&D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 03 /
Mckerrecher, Darren AstraZeneca R&D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 04 /
Boyd, Scott AstraZeneca R&D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 05 /
Caulkett, Peter AstraZeneca R&D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 06 /
Hargreaves, Rodney AstraZeneca R&D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 07 /
Jones, Clifford David AstraZeneca R&D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 08 /
Bowker, Suzanne AstraZeneca R&D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 09 /
Block, Michael Howard AstraZeneca R&D Boston 35 Gatehouse Drive Waltham MA-02451 / US | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Miller, Thomas Kerr, et al AstraZeneca AB Global Intellectual Property 151 85 Sodertalje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Miller, Thomas Kerr, et al AstraZeneca AB, Global Intellectual Property 151 85 Sodertalje / SE | Application number, filing date | 04028297.2 | 15.08.2002 | [2005/35] | Priority number, date | SE20010002764 | 17.08.2001 Original published format: SE 0102764 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1568367 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1568367 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP1568367 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/425, C07D417/12, C07D413/12, C07D413/14, C07D409/12, C07D409/14, C07D277/46 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
C07D213/75 (EP,US);
A61K31/166 (KR);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/195 (EP,US);
A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
C07D213/85 (EP,US);
C07D231/40 (EP,US);
C07D233/48 (EP,US);
C07D237/20 (EP,US);
C07D237/24 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
C07D241/20 (EP,US);
C07D241/26 (EP,US);
C07D261/14 (EP,US);
C07D277/46 (EP,US);
C07D277/56 (EP,US);
C07D277/82 (EP,US);
C07D285/135 (EP,US);
C07D307/66 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/35] | A61K31/425 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | 30.11.2004 | LT | 30.11.2004 | LV | 30.11.2004 | MK | 30.11.2004 | RO | 30.11.2004 | SI | 30.11.2004 | Title | German: | Glukokinase beeinflussende Verbindungen | [2005/35] | English: | Compounds effecting glucokinase | [2005/35] | French: | Composés exerçant une action sur la glucokinase | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2004 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 24.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02755165.4 / EP1420784 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Limitations: | 06.10.2008 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 24.03.2009 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 03.07.2009 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO0144216 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [AD] 1-21 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 10; claim 1 *; | [E]WO03000267 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [E] 1-21* claim 1 * |